The B Manischewitz Co., Llc v. All Seasons Services, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91125393-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo The B. Manischewitz Company, LLC, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "The B Manischewitz Co., LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin J. Beran roneill@ostrolenk.com
v.
No Logo All Seasons Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah L. Benson tmdocket@haslaw.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ELIZABETH ADUNN
Date in Location 29-SEP-03
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None T
    #14 Vacated; Amdt Appr.; Dsmsd W/o Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: None N
      Terminated
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: None T
        Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: None T
          Stip Withdrawal Of Oppostion
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None T
            Amendment Of 75838826
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: None T
              Procs Resumed; Answer Due 10-2-03; Trial Dates Reset
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: None T
                Def's Consented Mtn. To Extend Dates
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None S
                  Suspended
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: None T
                    D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: None T
                      D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: None T
                        Def Mot To Extend Time To File Answer
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None T
                          D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: None T
                            D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: None T
                              Pending, Instituted
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: None T
                                Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None N
                                  Filed And Fee
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?