Think Computer Corporation v. H. Co. Computer Products, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91125553-OPP

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Molly O'Brien Loussaert +1 612 492 7000 +1 612 492 7077 mloussaert@fredlaw.com
v.
No Logo H. Co. Computer Products, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Birch Stewart Kolasch & Birch, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Milton Small +1 310 209 4400 +1 310 209 4450
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney CHERYL ABUTLER
Date in Location 13-SEP-04
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
Charge to Location Code 84F
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: None T
    Copy Of The Board's Order Of 5/28/04 Remailed To Opposer
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None N
      Delete Entry
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: None T
        Mail Returned As Undeliverable
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None T
          Board's Decision: Sustained
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: None T
            Submitted On Brief
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: None T
              Applicant's Main Brief
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: None T
                Pl's Reply Brief
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None T
                  Pl's Main Brief
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: None T
                    P's Filing Of Certified Transcripts
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: None T
                      D's Filing Of Certified Transcripts
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None T
                        Def's Notice Of Reliance
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None T
                          Pls Notice Of Reliance
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 3/22/2003, Entered: None T
                            Joint Motion To Ext Approved
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: None T
                              Joint Motion And Stip. To Extend Discovery And Testimony Periods
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None T
                                Stipulated Protective Order
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: None T
                                  Joint Motion To Ext. Approved
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None T
                                    Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None T
                                      Def's Motion And Stip. To Extend Deadlin E
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: None N
                                        Answer
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None T
                                          Pending, Instituted
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None T
                                            Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None N
                                              Filed And Fee
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 674 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?