The B. Manischewitz Company, Llc v. Seaforth Creamery Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91150421-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo The B. Manischewitz Company, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin J. Beran roneill@ostrolenk.com
v.
No Logo Seaforth Creamery, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hancock & Estabrook, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George R. Mcguire, Esq.
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney KAREN SKUHLKE
Date in Location 01-MAY-03
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: None T
      Withdrawal Of Application
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 2/1/2003, Entered: None T
        Req Approved
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None T
          P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: None T
            P.o. Noted; Trial Dates Remain As Set
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: None P
              Stipulated Protective Order
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None T
                Trial Dates Reset
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: None T
                  P's Motion To Extend Discovery
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None N
                    Answer
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None T
                      Pending, Instituted
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None T
                        Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: None N
                          Filed And Fee
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 15 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?