The B. Manischewitz Company, Llc v. Four Seasons Fruit Soup, Corp.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91151477-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo The B. Manischewitz Company, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin J. Beran roneill@ostrolenk.com
v.
No Logo Four Seasons Fruit Soup Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Four Seasons Fruit Soup Corp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paulette D Hardin
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney DAVID MMERMELSTEIN
Date in Location 20-AUG-03
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Dismissed
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: None N
      Withdrawal Of Opposition
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None T
        P's Motion For An Extension Of Time
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: None T
          P's Mot Granted Amndt Approved Pl Allow 30 Days
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None T
            P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None T
              Stip Amendment
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None T
                P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: None T
                  P's Motion Granted
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: None T
                    P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: None T
                      P's Motion Grant As Uncontested
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None T
                        P's Motion For An Extension Of Time
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: None T
                          D's Discovery Responses
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: None T
                            Bd's Not Of Interrogatories Filed In Err Or
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: None T
                              D's Answer To P's Req For Documents
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None N
                                Answer
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: None T
                                  Pending, Instituted
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: None T
                                    Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None N
                                      Filed And Fee
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?