The B. Manischewitz Company, Llc v. New Zealand Lamb Cooperative, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91152478-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo The B. Manischewitz Company, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin J. Beran roneill@ostrolenk.com
v.
No Logo New Zealand Lamb Cooperative, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitman, Breed, Abbott & Morgan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard E. Mancuso,.
Type Opposition
Date in Location 09-JUL-03
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None T
      Stip Wd Of Opp Wo Prejudice
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: None T
        D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 11/24/2002, Entered: None S
          Suspended
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None T
            D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None T
              Ext Approved
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: None T
                D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: None T
                  Pending, Instituted
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: None T
                    Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None N
                      Filed And Fee
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 17 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?