Varsity Spirit Corporation And Varsity Spirit Fashions & Supplies, Inc. v. T-shirt International

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91153909-OPP
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Varsity Spirit Corporation And Varsity Spirit Fashions & Supplies, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Cowan Liebowitz & Latman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trademark Docketing trademark@cll.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder mjs@cll.com
v.
No Logo T-shirt International, Defendant

Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan Dortenzo +1 216 566 5500 +1 304 624 8183 smithmt@steptoe-johnson.com
Attributes
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ELIZABETH ADUNN
Date in Location 17-AUG-06
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
Charge to Location Code 84K
Timeline
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None T
Withdrawal Of Application With Consent
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None T
Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None T
Pl's Motion To Suspend With Consent
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None W
Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None W
Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/10/2006, Entered: None X
Proceedings Resumed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None T
Proceedings Suspended Six Months
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None T
P's Motion For Suspension W/con
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: None T
Proceedings Resumed; Trial Dates Reset
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None T
P's Motion To Reopen Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None N
Answer To Counterclaim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None T
Pl's C/a
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: None T
Mot To Extend Granted; Cc Answer Due 9/13/04
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: None T
Procs Resumed; Cc Answer Due 7/15/04
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: None T
D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: None T
Def's Withdrawal Of Mot To Ext Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None T
D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None T
Answer To Counterclaim Due 7/20/03
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: None T
Def's Response To #5
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None T
Def's Response Re-counter-claim Due 30 Days
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None N
Answer, Counterclaim To Cancel, No Fee
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: None T
Pending, Instituted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: None T
Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None N
Filed And Fee
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 27 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?