General Biscuits Belgie v. Joseph Smith
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91154806-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo General Biscuits Belgie, NV, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "General Biscuits Belgie"

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perla M. Kuhn +21283 760 00x6550 +1 212 422 4726 kuhn@hugheshubbard.com
v.
No Logo Joseph Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD W. GOLDSTEIN, ESQ
Type Opposition
Date in Location 10-JUN-03
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: None T
      Amendment After Publication
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None T
        P's W/drawal Of Notice Of Opposition W/out Prejudice
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 4/19/2003, Entered: None T
          Notice Of Default
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: None T
            Pending, Instituted
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: None T
              Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/1/2003, Entered: None N
                Filed And Fee
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 87 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?