The B. Manischewitz Company, Llc v. U.s. Finance & Investment Bankers
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91157071-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo The B. Manischewitz Company, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin J. Beran roneill@ostrolenk.com
v.
No Logo U.s. Finance & Investment Bankers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sanchelima & Associates, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jesus Sanchelina, Esq.
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney FRANCES SWOLFSON
Date in Location 12-FEB-04
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Sustained
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: None T
      Withdrawal Of Application
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: None N
        Answer
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None T
          Pending, Instituted
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None T
            Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None N
              Filed And Fee
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 8 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?