Hrb Royalty, Inc v. Interior Concepts Corporation
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91157561-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hrb Royalty, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
v.
No Logo Interior Concepts Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Gaffin +1 616 454 8656 gaffin@millercanfield.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney LINDA MSKORO
Date in Location 15-APR-04
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None N
      Withdrawal Of Opposition
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None N
        Answer
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None T
          Pending, Instituted
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None T
            Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: None N
              Filed And Fee
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 17 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?