The Sherwin-williams Company v. Robert D. Newman And Specilaty Products
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91157759-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherwin-Williams Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert E. Mcdonald, Reg. No. 29,193 Legal_IP@sherwin.com
v.
No Logo Robert D. Newman And Specilaty Products, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder vbs@hoveywilliams.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder tlm@hoveywilliams.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney CHERYL ABUTLER
Date in Location 21-JUN-06
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
Charge to Location Code 85K
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 31 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None N
      Withdrawal Of Opposition
        LREF
        Blank 29 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None W
        Extension Of Time Granted
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None W
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None T
            D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
              LREF
              Blank 26 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None W
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 25 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None T
                D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None W
                  Extension Of Time Granted
                    LREF
                    Blank 23 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None T
                    D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                      LREF
                      Blank 22 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: None W
                      Extension Of Time Granted
                        LREF
                        Blank 21 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: None T
                        D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                          LREF
                          Blank 20 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None T
                          Trial Dates Reset
                            LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None T
                            Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None P
                              Stipulation Noted And Approved
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None P
                                Stipulated Protective Order
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None W
                                  Extension Of Time Granted
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None T
                                    Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None W
                                      Extension Of Time Granted
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None T
                                        Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None W
                                          Extension Of Time Granted
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None T
                                            Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None T
                                              Trial Dates Reset
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: None T
                                                Other Filing
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None S
                                                  Suspended
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None T
                                                    D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: None T
                                                      Req Approved
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: None T
                                                        D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: None N
                                                          Answer
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None T
                                                            Pending, Instituted
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None T
                                                              Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None N
                                                                Filed And Fee
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?