Trek Bicycle Corporation v. Great Plains Manufacturing, Incorporated
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91158673-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Trek Bicycle Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Merz & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Catherine Merz jwidmer@merz-law.com
v.
No Logo Great Plains Manufacturing, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Great Plains Manufacturing, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ELIZABETH ADUNN
Date in Location 17-NOV-04
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
Charge to Location Code 84K
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None T
      Other Filing
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None N
        Withdrawal Of Opposition
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None S
          Suspended
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None T
            Other Filing
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: None S
              Suspended
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None T
                D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None T
                  Def's Motion For Ext Approved
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None T
                    D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: None T
                      Def's Mot To File First Amended Ans.
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: None N
                        Answer
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None T
                          Pending, Instituted
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None T
                            Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None N
                              Filed And Fee
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?