Lifelink Md, Inc. v. Defibtech, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91158836-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lifelink Md, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valarie Brennan vbrennan@hhlaw.com
v.
No Logo Defibtech LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cullen G. Taylor boxip@hhlaw.com
Type Opposition
Date in Location 10-AUG-04
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: None T
      Opposer Allowed 30 Days To File Written Consent Of Applicant
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None N
        Withdrawal Of Opposition
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: None T
          Req Approved
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: None T
            P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None T
              Req Granted
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: None T
                P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: None T
                  Req Approved
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: None T
                    D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None N
                      Answer
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: None T
                        D's Appearance Of Counsel/power Of Attorney
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None T
                          Pending, Instituted
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None T
                            Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None N
                              Filed And Fee
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?