Dole Food Company, Inc v. Ito Packing Co.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91159631-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Dole Food Dole Food, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Dole Food Company, Inc"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dole Food Company, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy J. Oswald marcy_reed@na.dole.com
v.
No Logo Ito Packing Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ito Packing Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Dole Food Company, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy J. Oswald marcy_reed@na.dole.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney GEORGEPOLOGEORGIS
Date in Location 18-APR-06
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
Charge to Location Code 84K
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None T
Undeliverable Mail
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None N
    Terminated
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None T
      Board's Decision: Sustained
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None T
        Undelverable Mail
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None T
          Notice Of Default
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None T
            Pending, Instituted
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None T
              Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: None N
                Filed And Fee
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 21 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?