Varsity Spirit Corporation, Varsity Spirit Fashions & Supplies, Inc. v. Headmaster, Inc.

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91160147-OPP
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Varsity Spirit Corporation, Varsity Spirit Fashions & Supplies, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Cowan Liebowitz & Latman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder mjs@cll.com
v.
No Logo Headmaster, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Kring & Chung, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth W. Chung +1 949 261 7895 +1 949 261 8800 gmarcot@kringandchung.com
Attributes
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney LINDA MSKORO
Date in Location 17-AUG-05
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
Charge to Location Code 84K
Timeline
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None N
Terminated
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None T
Board's Decision: Sustained
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None T
Abandonment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None W
Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None T
Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None T
Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: None T
Pl Coa
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None N
Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None T
Pending, Instituted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None T
Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None N
Filed And Fee
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 29 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?