Barrow Energies, Inc. v. Ferrellgas Partners L.p.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91160296-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barrow Energies, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeanene L. Jobst, Esq. jjobst@wcsr.com
v.
No Logo Ferrellgas Partners, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ANDREW PBAXLEY
Date in Location 05-MAY-06
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
Charge to Location Code 84K
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None N
      Withdrawal Of Opposition
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None S
        Suspended Pending Disp Of Civil Action
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None T
          Paper Received At Ttab
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None T
            Parties Alowed 30 Days To Show Status Of Civil Action
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: None T
              Returned Mail
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None T
                Change Of Correspondence Address
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: None S
                  Suspended Pending Disp Of Civil Action
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None W
                    P's Mot To Susp Pend Disp Civ Action
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None N
                      Answer
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None T
                        Pending, Instituted
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None T
                          Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: None N
                            Filed And Fee
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 19 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?