Lsm Consulting Corporation v. Healy, Kent
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91164755-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lsm Consulting Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sachnoff & Weaver, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space E. Leonard Rubin +1 312 207 6464
v.
No Logo Healy, Kent, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder cweinstein@foleyhoag.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder gmaclellan@foleyhoag.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney JYLL STAYLOR
Date in Location 14-MAR-06
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 25 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: None N
      Withdrawal Of Opposition
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: None P
        Stipulation Noted And Approved
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: None T
          Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: None W
            Extension Of Time Granted
              LREF
              Blank 20 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: None T
              Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                LREF
                Blank 19 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None W
                Extension Of Time Granted
                  LREF
                  Blank 18 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None T
                  Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None W
                    Extension Of Time Granted
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None T
                      Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None W
                        Extension Of Time Granted
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None T
                          Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None W
                            Extension Of Time Granted
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None T
                              Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None W
                                Extension Of Time Granted
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None T
                                  Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None W
                                    Extension Of Time Granted
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None T
                                      Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None W
                                        Extension Of Time Granted
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None T
                                          Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: None W
                                            Extension Of Time Granted
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: None T
                                              Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None T
                                                Pending, Instituted
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None T
                                                  Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None N
                                                    Filed And Fee
                                                      LREF

                                                      Space Space

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?