Knit-rite, Inc. v. The Peds Company
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91165005-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Knit-rite, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
v.
No Logo The Peds Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Moore & Van Allen, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur J. Debaugh artdebaugh@mvalaw.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder pto_tmconfirmation@mvalaw.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney FRANCES SWOLFSON
Date in Location 26-APR-05
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None T
    Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None T
      Withdrawal Of Application With Consent
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None W
        Extension Of Time Granted
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None T
          Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None W
            Extension Of Time Granted
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None T
              Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None W
                Extension Of Time Granted
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None T
                  Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None W
                    Extension Of Time Granted
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None T
                      Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None W
                        Extension Of Time Granted
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None T
                          Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None W
                            Extension Of Time Granted
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None T
                              Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None T
                                Change Of Correspondence Address
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: None W
                                  Extension Of Time Granted
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: None T
                                    Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: None W
                                      Extension Of Time Granted
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: None T
                                        Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None T
                                          Pending, Instituted
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None T
                                            Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None N
                                              Filed And Fee
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?