Nautica Apparel, Inc. v. St. Maarten 12 Metre Enterprises N.v.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91167747-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nautica Apparel, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Rannells, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space d.comunale@br-tmlaw.com
Space b.gaynor@br-tmlaw.com
Space K.Hnasko@br-tmlaw.com
v.
No Logo St. Maarten 12 Metre Enterprises N.v., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney LINDA MSKORO
Date in Location 07-FEB-06
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Sustained
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None T
      Withdrawal Of Application
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None S
        Suspended
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None W
          Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None T
            Change Of Correspondence Address
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None S
              Suspended
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None W
                Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None S
                  Suspended
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None W
                    Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None N
                      Answer
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None W
                        Extension Of Time Granted
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None T
                          Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None T
                            Pending, Instituted
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None T
                              Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None N
                                Filed And Fee
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 31 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?