Negro Leagues Baseball Museum, Inc. v. Darryl White
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91168831-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Negro Leagues Baseball Museum, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
v.
No Logo Darryl White, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Select Brands Inc tmdocketing.elbein@hoveywilliams.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder melbein@hoveywilliams.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney CHERYL ABUTLER
Date in Location 14-MAR-06
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None T
Board's Decision: Sustained
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None T
    Withdrawal Of Application
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None T
      Response Due 30 Days (due Date)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None T
        Change Of Correspondence Address
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None T
          D's Revocation Of Power Of Attorney
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None S
            Suspended
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None W
              Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None W
                Extension Of Time Granted
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None T
                  Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None W
                    Extension Of Time Granted
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None T
                      Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None W
                        Extension Of Time Granted
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None T
                          Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None W
                            Extension Of Time Granted
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None T
                              Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None N
                                Answer
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None T
                                  Pending, Instituted
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None T
                                    Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None N
                                      Filed And Fee
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?