Si Barghelame v. Sunlight Saunas, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91169306-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Si Barghelame, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by David L. Garrison Ps

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Garrison dlg@skaya.com
v.
No Logo Sunlight Saunas, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder akelly@shb.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jglidewell@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jhill@shb.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ROBERTCOGGINS
Date in Location 24-MAR-06
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None A
Court's Decision: Dismissed
    LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None T
    D's Certicate Of Mailing
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None N
      Appeal To Cafc
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None T
        Board's Decision: Sustained
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None E
          Submitted On Brief
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None T
            P's Rebuttal Brief
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None N
              Final Brief On Merits For Defendant(s)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None T
                Brief On Merits For Plaintiff
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None T
                  Brief Due Dates Reset
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None T
                    P's Consent To D's Extension
                      LREF
                      Blank 31 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None T
                      Change Of Correspondence Address
                        LREF
                        Blank 30 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: None T
                        D's Motion To Sub Exhibit A To Notice Of Reliance
                          LREF
                          Blank 29 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None N
                          Defendant's Notice Of Reliance
                            LREF
                            Blank 28 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None T
                            D's Motion For An Extension Of Time
                              LREF
                              Blank 27 Filed: 9/27/2008, Entered: None W
                              Extension Of Time Granted
                                LREF
                                Blank 26 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None T
                                Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 25 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None T
                                  D's Appearance Of Counsel/power Of Attorney
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 24 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None N
                                    Testimony For Plaintiff
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None N
                                      Testimony For Plaintiff
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None S
                                        Suspended
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 21 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None W
                                          Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: None T
                                            Change Of Correspondence Address
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None T
                                              Proceeding Consolidated W 91169318; Trial Dates Remain As Set
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None T
                                                P's Motion To Consolidate
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None W
                                                  Extension Of Time Granted
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None T
                                                    Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None T
                                                      Change Of Correspondence Address
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None S
                                                        Suspended
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None T
                                                          Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None W
                                                            Extension Of Time Granted
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None T
                                                              Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None T
                                                                Motion To Compel Moot; Trial Dates Reset
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None T
                                                                  P's Opposition/response To Motion
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None S
                                                                    Suspended Pending Disp Of Outstndng Mot
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None M
                                                                      D's Motion To Compel Discovery
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None W
                                                                        Extension Of Time Granted
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None T
                                                                          Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: None N
                                                                            Answer
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None T
                                                                              Pending, Instituted
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None T
                                                                                Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: None N
                                                                                  Filed And Fee
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 20 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?