Think Computer Corporation v. H. Co. Computer Products
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91173792-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Think Computer Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
v.
No Logo H. Co. Computer Products, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "H. Co. Computer Products"

Toggle Switch Represented by Christie Parker & Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William R. Cohrs pto@cph.com
Space Steven Erick Lauridsen +1 626 795 9900 +1 626 577 8800 steven.lauridsen@cph.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ROBERTCOGGINS
Date in Location 07-NOV-06
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None T
Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None T
    Stip To Dismiss W Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 28 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None S
      Suspended
        LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None W
        Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None T
          D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None T
            D's Motion For An Extension Of Time
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None W
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None T
                D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None W
                  Extension Of Time Granted
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None T
                    D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None W
                      Extension Of Time Granted
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None T
                        D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None W
                          Extension Of Time Granted
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None T
                            D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None T
                              Change Of Correspondence Address
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None T
                                Change Of Correspondence Address
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None T
                                  Motion To Consoldate Granted, Trail Dates Set.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None T
                                    Motion To Consolidate
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None W
                                      Extension Of Time Granted
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None T
                                        Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 9/9/2007, Entered: None T
                                          Change Of Correspondence Address
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None W
                                            Extension Of Time Granted
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None T
                                              D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None W
                                                Extension Of Time Granted
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None T
                                                  D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None N
                                                    Plaintiff's Notice Of Reliance
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None N
                                                      Answer
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None T
                                                        Pending, Instituted
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None T
                                                          Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None N
                                                            Filed And Fee
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 620 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?