Edmont P. D'ascoli, Trustee Of The Edmont P. D'ascoli Revocable Living Trust Dated May 24, 1996 v. Sinks, Edward M.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91174859-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edmont P. D'ascoli, Trustee Of The Edmont P. D'ascoli Revocable Living Trust Dated May 24, 1996, Plaintiff

Represented by Cades Schutte LLP

v.
No Logo Sinks, Edward M., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sinks, Edward M. tsinks@columbus.rr.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ANGELALYKOS
Date in Location 28-DEC-06
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Sustained
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None T
      Notice Of Default
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None T
        Pending, Instituted
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None T
          Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None N
            Filed And Fee
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 21 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?