The Doctors Company v. Missouri Doctors Mutual Insurance, Co.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91175895-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo The Doctors Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thelen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trademark Docketing trademark@thelenreid.com
Space Marlene Janet Williams +1 415 369 7368 +1 415 371 1211 mjwilliams@thelenreid.com
v.
No Logo Missouri Doctors Mutual Insurance, Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney MARY CATHERINEFAINT
Date in Location 28-FEB-07
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Sustained
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None T
      Withdrawal Of Application
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None S
        Suspended
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None W
          Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None N
            Answer
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None T
              Change Of Correspondence Address
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None T
                Pending, Instituted
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None T
                  Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None N
                    Filed And Fee
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 20 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?