Digital Vision Resources Group, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91176734-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of JOHN GREGORY PERRY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jhicks@wcsr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trademark Docketing trademarkswinston@wcsr.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder tsharpe@wcsr.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder cbeaman@wcsr.com
v.
No Logo Digital Vision Resources Group, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ANNLINNEHAN
Date in Location 13-APR-07
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Sustained
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None T
      Withdrawal Of Application
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None S
        Suspended
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None W
          Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None N
            Answer
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None T
              Pending, Instituted
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None T
                Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None N
                  Filed And Fee
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 27 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?