Tommy Hilfiger Licensing Llc v. Isdin, S.a.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91179417-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tommy Hilfiger Licensing LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pattishall McAuliffe Newbury Hilliard & Geraldson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ashly Ann Iacullo +1 312 554 7987 ai@pattishall.com
Space Alexis Elizabeth Payne +1 312 554 8000 +1 312 554 8015 aep@pattishall.com
v.
No Logo Isdin, S.a., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MCNAIR LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas W. Kim dkim@mcnair.net;IPDocket@mcnair.net
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney MARY CATHERINEFAINT
Date in Location 11-SEP-07
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (19) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None T
Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None T
    Withdrawal Of Application
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None W
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None T
        Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None W
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None T
            D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None W
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None T
                Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None N
                  Answer
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None W
                    Extension Of Time Granted
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None T
                      D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None T
                        Pending, Instituted
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None T
                          Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None N
                            Filed And Fee
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 784 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?