The Coca-cola Company v. Sunlight Saunas, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91180647-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

The Coca-Cola Company The Coca-Cola Company, Plaintiff
The Coca-Cola Company Officer/Director, The Coca-Cola Company
Officer/Director, Hansen Natural Corp
Officer/Director, Calyxt, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vir Biotechnology, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce William Baber +1 404 572 4826 +1 404 572 5100 bbaber@kslaw.com
Space Elizabeth Bienko Brown +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 EBrown@KSLAW.com
v.
No Logo Sunlight Saunas, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ANGELALYKOS
Date in Location 08-NOV-07
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None T
Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None N
    Withdrawal Of Opposition
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None W
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None T
        Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None P
          Correction To Board`s Order
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None T
            Change Of Correspondence Address
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None N
              Answer
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None S
                Suspended
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None W
                  Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None S
                    Suspended
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None W
                      D's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None T
                        Motions Granted
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None W
                          Extension Of Time Granted
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None T
                            Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None T
                              Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None T
                                Pending, Instituted
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None T
                                  Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None N
                                    Filed And Fee
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 32 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?