Mccormick Distilling Co., Inc. v. Keystone Distillery, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91184284-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mccormick Distilling Company, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Mccormick Distilling Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Select Brands Inc tmdocketing.elbein@hoveywilliams.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jcrawford@hoveywilliams.com
v.
No Logo Keystone Distillery, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lipton Weinberger and Husick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah Anne Logan +1 610 296 8259 DLogan@LWH-law.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ANGELALYKOS
Date in Location 23-MAY-08
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None T
Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None N
    Withdrawal Of Opposition
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None W
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None T
        Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None T
          Copy Of Answer Forwarded To Opposer's Counsel
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None N
            Answer
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None W
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None T
                D's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None T
                  Pending, Instituted
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None T
                    Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None N
                      Filed And Fee
                        LREF

                        Space Space

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 44 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?