Interactive Supercomputing, Inc. v. Starpound Technologies, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91188353-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Interactive Supercomputing Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder shudson@foleyhoag.com
v.
No Logo Starpound Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Trusted Cousnel (ashley), LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan T. Craighead
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney FRANCES SWOLFSON
Date in Location 12-JAN-09
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None T
Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None N
    Withdrawal Of Opposition
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 4/4/2009, Entered: None T
      Response Due 30 Days (due Date)
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None T
        Other Motions/papers
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None T
          Applicant's Certificate Of Service
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None M
            Motion To Amend Application
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None W
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None T
                Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None T
                  Pending, Instituted
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None T
                    Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None N
                      Filed And Fee
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 12 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?