Red Hat, Inc. v. Open Scan Technologies, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91188640-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space resnick.adam@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Delmore Greene LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder tmdocket@arentfox.com
v.
No Logo Open Scan Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Hodson Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Mcloon Hodson hodson@coloradobusinesslaw.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney YONG OH (RICHARD)KIM
Date in Location 30-JAN-09
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None T
Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None T
    Withdrawal Of Application
      LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None W
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None T
        Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None W
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None T
            Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None W
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None T
                Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None T
                  Pending, Instituted
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None T
                    Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None N
                      Filed And Fee
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 79 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?