Moovers, Inc. v. Square Cow Moovers LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91190903-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Moovers, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
v.
No Logo Square Cow Moovers LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by YOURTRADEMARKATTORNEY.COM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Morris E. Turek +1 314 749 4059 +1 800 961 0363 morris@yourtrademarkattorney.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ANNLINNEHAN
Date in Location 06-JUL-09
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None T
Board's Decision: Sustained
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None T
    Withdrawal Of Application
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None W
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None T
        Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None W
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None T
            Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None T
              D's Appearance Of Counsel/power Of Attorney
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None T
                Pending, Instituted
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None T
                  Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None N
                    Filed And Fee
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 27 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?