Caretech Solutions, Inc. v. Texas Legal Copies, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91192614-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CareTech Solutions, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

v.
No Logo Texas Legal Copies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carstens & Cahoon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bobby Wayne Braxton +1 972 367 2001 +1 972 367 2002 braxton@cclaw.com
Space Casey L Griffith +1 214 367 6000 +1 214 764 6673 casey.griffith@kk-llp.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder watkins@cclaw.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ANNLINNEHAN
Date in Location 11-NOV-09
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None T
Board's Decision: Dismissed
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: None N
    Withdrawal Of Opposition
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None T
      Response Due 30 Days (due Date)
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None W
        Extension Of Time Granted
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None T
          Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None T
            Motion To Amend Application
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None W
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None T
                Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None W
                  Extension Of Time Granted
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None T
                    Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None W
                      Extension Of Time Granted
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None T
                        Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None W
                          Extension Of Time Granted
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None T
                            Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None W
                              Extension Of Time Granted
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None T
                                Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None W
                                  Extension Of Time Granted
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None T
                                    Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None W
                                      Extension Of Time Granted
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None T
                                        Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None W
                                          Extension Of Time Granted
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None T
                                            Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None W
                                              Extension Of Time Granted
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None T
                                                Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None W
                                                  Extension Of Time Granted
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None T
                                                    Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None S
                                                      Suspended
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None W
                                                        Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: None T
                                                          Pending, Instituted
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: None T
                                                            Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: None N
                                                              Filed And Fee
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 44 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?