Red Hat, Inc. v. Whitehat Security, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91194177-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sally Abel, Esq., Tanda Neundorf, Esq. trademark@fenwick.com
v.
No Logo Whitehat Security, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ross Q. Panko ross.panko@arentfox.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney MICHAEL BADLIN
Date in Location 17-MAR-10
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (9) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None T
Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None N
    Withdrawal Of Opposition
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None W
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None T
        D's Motion For An Extension Of Time
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None N
          Answer
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None W
            Extension Of Time Granted
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None T
              Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None T
                Pending, Instituted
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None T
                  Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None N
                    Filed And Fee
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 98 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?