Thompson v. Social Security
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-00426-LAB-RBB
District Judge Larry Alan Burns, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Lynn Thompson, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Social Security, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
Office San Diego
Filed 4/4/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 862 - Social Security: Black Lung
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County San Diego
Terminated 5/21/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/21/08. (pdc)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Mail Returned
    Mail Returned as Undeliverable re [9] Order. Mail sent to 1333 Frountaire St. San Diego, CA 92101 (pdc) (av1).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Provide his Current Address. Should he fail to provide his current address, this action will be dismissed without prejudice without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/25/08. (pdc) (av1).
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Mail Returned
        Mail Returned as Undeliverable re [7] Summons Issued, [6] Order Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, USM 285 forms. Mail sent to 1333 Frountaire St. San Diego, CA 92101. (pdc) (av1).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Summons Issued
          Summons Issued as to Social Security. (Attachments: # (1) Letter)(pdc) (kaj, ).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma paupCourt Filing
            ORDER Granting [2] Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; Directing United States Marshal to Effect Service of Process; and Denying [3] Motion for Appointment of Counsel, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 4/4/08. (IFP package sent) (pdc)(kaj).
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Mail Returned
              Mail Returned as Undeliverable re [4] Order of Reference Mail sent to 1333 Frountaire St., San Diego, CA 92101 (pdc)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER of Reference: It is hereby ordered all matters arising out of this social security appeal, including the motion to proceed in forma pauperis and the request for appointment of counsel, are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks for a Report and Recommendation on the disposition of the case. The parties are instructed to contact Magistrate Judge Brooks chambers with respect to all scheduling, hearing, or other issues. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/13/2008. (pdc)(kaj, ).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lynn Thompson (knh)(mam).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008, Terminated: 4/4/2008 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lynn Thompson. (knh)(mam).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT against Social Security (IFP filed), filed by Lynn Thompson.(knh)(mam).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 169 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?