Ev Group E. Thallner Gmbh v. Brewer Science, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91197997-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ev Group E. Thallner GmbH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Samuel Cotropia +1 214 981 3305 ccotropia@sidley.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder sboughnou@sidley.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jchester@sidley.com
Space Thomas N Tarnay +1 214 981 3300 +1 214 981 3400 ttarnay@sidley.com
v.
No Logo BREWER SCIENCE, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Select Brands Inc tmdocketing.elbein@hoveywilliams.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jcrawford@hoveywilliams.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney GEORGEPOLOGEORGIS
Date in Location 27-DEC-10
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None T
Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None T
    Stipulated Motion For Withdrawal Of Oppositions
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None T
      Consolidated; Child Of 91197997
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None T
        Change Of Correspondence Address
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None P
          Correction To Board`s Order
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None S
            Suspended
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 1/16/2011, Entered: None W
              P's Mot To Susp Pend Disp Civ Action
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None T
                Pending, Instituted
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None T
                  Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None N
                    Filed And Fee
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 29 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?