Ev Group E. Thallner Gmbh v. Brewer Science, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91199304-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ev Group E. Thallner GmbH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Samuel Cotropia +1 214 981 3305 ccotropia@sidley.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder sboughnou@sidley.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jchester@sidley.com
Space Thomas N Tarnay +1 214 981 3300 +1 214 981 3400 ttarnay@sidley.com
v.
No Logo BREWER SCIENCE, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott R. Brown +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 srb@hoveywilliams.com
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jcrawford@hoveywilliams.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney GEORGEPOLOGEORGIS
Date in Location 06-APR-11
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None T
Bd's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None T
    Consolidated - Chilid Of 91197117
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None S
      Suspended
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None W
        Stip To Suspend Pend Disp Civ Action
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None T
          Pending, Instituted
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None T
            Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None N
              Filed And Fee
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 32 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?