The Worlds Pageants, LLC v. Miss G-string International LLC

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91200183-OPP
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 29, 2016 at 8:12 AM EST (8.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo The Worlds Pageants LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Aquilla Patents & Marks PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Tracy Aquilla +1 603 253 9474 +1 603 290 5577 info@aquillapatents.com
v.
No Logo Miss G String International LLC, Defendant

Represented by Luke Charles Lirot, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luke Charles Lirot +1 727 536 2100 +1 727 536 2110 luke2@lirotlaw.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jimmy@lirotlaw.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder krista@lirotlaw.com
Attributes
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ANDREW PBAXLEY
Date in Location 09-JUN-11
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
Timeline
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None T
Bd Decision: Dismissed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None T
Bd Decision: Dismissed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None E
Submitted On Brief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None T
Bd's Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None N
D Final Brief: Tm Rule 2.128
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None T
Response Due 30 Days (due Date)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None T
P Final Brief: Tm Rule 2.128
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None T
Response Due 30 Days (due Date)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None M
D Mot For Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None T
P Mot For Ext W/o Consent
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None T
D Req For Oral Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None X
Proceedings Resumed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None N
D Testimony
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None N
D Testimony
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None G
Trial Dates Remain As Set
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None T
D Resp To Bd Order/inquiry
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None X
Proceedings Resumed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None S
Susp Pend Disp Of Outstndng Mot
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None M
D Mot For Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None N
P Notice Of Reliance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None D
D Mot For Summary Jgt Denied
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None T
D Opp/resp To Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None T
D Mot For Default Jgt On Counterclaim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None M
P Mot For Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None M
D Mot For Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/24/2014, Entered: None S
Susp Pend Disp Of Outstndng Mot
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None M
D Mot For Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None T
D's Discovery Responses
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None X
Proceedings Resumed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None X
Proceedings Resumed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None T
D Opp/resp To Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/11/2013, Entered: None S
Susp Pend Disp Of Outstndng Mot
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None T
P Mot To Dismiss Counterclaim: Frcp 12(b)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/29/2013, Entered: None T
Suspended/response Due Twenty Days
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None M
D Mot For Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None T
D's Reply In Support Of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None T
P's Opposition/response To Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None M
D's Motion To Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None T
Other Motions/papers
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None T
Consolidated; Suspended
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None T
D's Amended Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None T
Motion To Amend Answer/amended Answer Or Counterclaim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None T
Motion To Amend Answer/amended Answer Or Counterclaim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None T
Board's Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None T
Response Due In (20) Days
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None T
D's Reply In Support Of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None T
P's Opposition/response To Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None S
Suspended Pending Disp Of Outstndng Mot
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None M
D's Motion To Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None T
D's Opposition/response To Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None S
Suspended
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None M
P's Motion To Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None T
P's Assignment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None T
D's Initial Disclosures
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None N
Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None T
Pending, Instituted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None T
Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None N
Filed And Fee
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 369 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?