Vo v. Rice et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-00444-J-POR
District Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sean Ngoc Vo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by montagnadalin.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert George Nadalin +1 619 234 8875 robert@montagnadalin.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
No Logo Jeffrey C Schwenk, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
No Logo Kenneth J Fairfax, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
Office San Diego
Filed 3/10/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County San Diego
Terminated 5/2/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER Re [4] Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Napoleon A. Jones, Jr on 5/2/08. (aje)
    LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008, Terminated: 5/2/2008 Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss by Sean Ngoc Vo. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Nadalin, Robert) (aje).
      LREF
      Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Ngoc Vo. Condoleezza Rice served on 3/18/2008, answer due 5/19/2008; Kenneth J Fairfax served on 3/18/2008, answer due 5/19/2008; Jeffrey C Schwenk served on 3/18/2008, answer due 5/19/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service Certified Mail Receipts)(Nadalin, Robert). (jah).
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Summons Issued
      Summons Issued as to Condoleezza Rice, Kenneth J Fairfax, Jeffrey C Schwenk. (ecl)
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Complaint in Mandamus
        COMPLAINT IN MANDAMUS against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 Receipt number 148592.), filed by Sean Ngoc Vo.(ecl)(kaj).
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 51 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?