Dollar Financial Group, Inc. v. Hrb Innovations, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91204289-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dollar Financial Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 4500, 855 - 2nd Street S.w.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lorraine Pinsent; Bennett Jones Llp bassam.ibrahim@bipc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder florence@bipc.com
v.
No Logo Hrb Innovations, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
Space Select Brands Inc tmdocketing.elbein@hoveywilliams.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder litigation@hoveywilliams.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder jcrawford@hoveywilliams.com
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ROBERTCOGGINS
Date in Location 14-MAR-12
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None T
Bd Decision: Dismissed W/o Prej
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 2/18/2013, Entered: None N
    Withdrawal Of Opposition
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None W
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None T
        Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None W
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None T
            Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None W
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None T
                P's Motion For An Extension Of Time
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None W
                  Extension Of Time Granted
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None T
                    P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None N
                      Answer
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None T
                        Pending, Instituted
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None T
                          Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None N
                            Filed And Fee
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 52 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?