USA v. Bachman
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-00710-DMS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell D Dembin +1 619 557 5558 +1 619 557 7381 Mitch.Dembin@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Diego
Filed 3/11/2008
County San Diego
Terminated 7/18/2008
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344; 182 - Bank Fraud; Aiding and Abetting
Count 12
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956(a)(1)(A)(i) - Money Laundering
Count 13-15
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1001.F
Offense Level 4
181001 - False Statements to Federal Officer
Count 16-18
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028(a)(1) - Aggravated Identity Theft
Count 2-4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344; 182 - Bank Fraud; Aiding and Abetting
Count 5-6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 - False Statements on Loan Applications
Count 7
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 408.F
Offense Level 4
42408(a)(7)(B) - False Use of Social Security Account Number
Count 8
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028(a)(1) - Aggravated Identity Theft
Count 9-11
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028(a)(1) - Aggravated Identity Theft
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Micah Bachman (1), Count(s) 1, Custody of BOP for 37 months as to Counts 1, 7 and 12 concurrently. 5 years supervised release. No fine. $100 penalty assessment. Restitution of $255,928.75.; Count(s) 12, 7, Custody of BOP for 37 months as to Counts 1, 7 and 12 concurrently. 3 years supervised release. No fine. $100 penalty assessment; Count(s) 13-15, 16-18, 2-4, 5-6, 9-11, Dismissed; Count(s) 8, Custody of BOP for 24 months to run consecutive to Counts 1, 7 and 12. No fine. $100 penalty assessment. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (lao)(kaj).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 SentencingCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: P/O Report and Sentencing held on 7/18/2008 for Micah Bachman (1). Defendant sentenced to custody of BOP for 61 months as follows: 37 months as to Counts 1, 7 and 12 concurrently, 24 months as to Count 8 to run consecutive to Counts 1, 7 and 12. 5 years supervised release as to Count 1; 3 years supervised release as to Counts 7 and 12, to run concurrent to Count 1. No fine. $400 penalty assessment. Restitution of $255,928.75. Remaining counts dismissed. (Court Reporter LeeAnn Pence).(Plaintiff Attorney AUSA Mitchell D Dembin).(Defendant Attorney Kay L Sunday CJA, Sandra Resnick). (jak)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Sentencing Summary Chart
      SENTENCING SUMMARY CHART by USA as to Micah Bachman (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service, # (2) Spreadsheet)(Dembin, Mitchell) (lao).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Plea Agreement
        PLEA AGREEMENT as to Micah Bachman (lao)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Change of Plea Hearing as to Micah Bachman held on 4/30/2008. Plea entered by Micah Bachman (1) - Guilty Counts 1,7,8,12. (Sentence With Probation Office Report set for 7/18/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.) (Court Reporter LeeAnn Pence).(Plaintiff Attorney AUSA Mitchell D Dembin).(Defendant Attorney Kay L Sunday CJA). (jak)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Motion Hearing/Trial SettingCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing/Trial Setting not held. Defense oral motion to continue-GRANTED. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting continued to 4/30/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (Court Reporter LeeAnn Pence).(Plaintiff Attorney AUSA Mitchell Dembin).(Defendant Attorney Kay Sunday). (bjb)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
              ORDER OF DETENTION on Defendant's Waiver of Bail Pending Trial as to Micah Bachman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/24/08. This Order is entered without prejudice. (lao)(kaj).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Order on Motion to DetainCourt Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia : finding as moot [4] Motion to Detain as to Micah Bachman (1); Detention Hearing as to Micah Bachman not held on 3/18/2008. Defendant waives Detention/Bail hearing without prejudice. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Court to prepare order. (Tape #AJB08-1;15:44-15:48.)(Plaintiff Attorney AUSA Mitchell Demblin).(Defendant Attorney Kay L. Sunday). (ibf)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Mitchell D Dembin appearing for USA. (Dembin, Mitchell) (lao).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Motion to Detain
                    GOVERNMENTS ORAL MOTION to Detain by USA as to Micah Bachman. (ymm)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia : Initial Appearance as to Micah Bachman held on 3/13/2008, Arraignment as to Micah Bachman (1) Count 1-4,5-6,7,8-11,12,13-15,16-18 held on 3/13/2008, Not Guilty plea entered, Attorney Kay L Sunday Appointed for Micah Bachman. Governments Oral Motion for Detention as to Risk of Flight. Detention Hearing set for 3/18/2008 03:30 PM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 4/25/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (Tape #AJB08-1: 1103-1107).(Plaintiff Attorney Mitch Dembin).(Defendant Attorney Victor Pippins, FD (s/a)). (ymm)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Arrest
                        Arrest of Micah Bachman (ymm)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Warrant IssuedCourt Filing
                          ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Judge Louisa S Porter in case as to Micah Bachman. (lao) (av1, ).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Indictment
                            INDICTMENT as to Micah Bachman (1) count(s) 1-4, 5-6, 7, 8-11, 12, 13-15, 16-18. (rmm)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 93 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?