William Eadie v. The Worlds Pageants, LLC

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92055838-CAN
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo William Eadie, Plaintiff

Represented by Luke Charles Lirot, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luke Charles Lirot +1 727 536 2100 +1 727 536 2110 luke2@lirotlaw.com
v.
No Logo The Worlds Pageants LLC, Defendant

Represented by Luke Charles Lirot, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luke Charles Lirot +1 727 536 2100 +1 727 536 2110 luke2@lirotlaw.com
Attributes
Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney ANDREW PBAXLEY
Date in Location 12-JUL-12
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
Timeline
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None T
Paper Received At Ttab
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None T
P's Motion To Amend Pleading/amended Pleading
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None T
P's Motion To Amend Pleading/amended Pleading
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None T
D's Motion To Dismiss - Rule 12(b)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None T
Copy Of #1
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None T
Pending, Instituted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None T
Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None N
Filed And Fee
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 24 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?