International Telephone And Telegraph Co v. International Mobile Machines Corporatio
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92013615-CAN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo International Telephone And Telegraph Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "International Telephone And Telegraph Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space
v.
No Logo International Mobile Machines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "International Mobile Machines Corporatio"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space
Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney PAULA THAIRSTON
Date in Location 24-JUL-95
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
Charge to Location Code 000
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 7/13/1988, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 28 Filed: 10/14/1986, Entered: None T
    Court Decision Issued As A Mandate 10/10/86
      LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 9/15/1986, Entered: None A
      Court's Decision:reversed
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 12/11/1985, Entered: None T
        Appeal To Cafc Ack.
          LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 11/29/1985, Entered: None N
          Appeal To Cafc
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 10/4/1985, Entered: None T
            Board's Decision: Granted
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 5/22/1985, Entered: None E
              Pending (awaiting Decision)
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 4/29/1985, Entered: None T
                Oral Hearing Set (due Date)
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 1/22/1985, Entered: None T
                  Rebuttal Brief
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 2/1/1985, Entered: None T
                    #s 18 And 19 Forwd To D's Attys.; D's Brief Due 3-4-85
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/24/1984, Entered: None T
                      Brief Due 1-22-84
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 12/24/1984, Entered: None T
                        Motions To Strike And Dismiss Denied
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/31/1984, Entered: None T
                          Plaintiff's Response To Motion To Strike
                            LREF
                            Blank 16 Filed: 10/5/1984, Entered: None M
                            D's Motion To Strike
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 10/2/1984, Entered: None T
                              Brief On Merits For Plaintiff
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 9/24/1984, Entered: None T
                                Plaintiff's Reply To Opposition To Extension Of Time & Motion To Dismiss
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 9/19/1984, Entered: None T
                                  Defendant's Supplemental To Opposition To Extension Of Time & Motion To Dismiss
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 9/10/1984, Entered: None T
                                    Defendant's Opposition To Extend; Motion To Dismiss
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 9/7/1984, Entered: None T
                                      P's Motion For An Extension Of Time
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 7/24/1984, Entered: None T
                                        Request For Hearing Noted
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 7/13/1984, Entered: None T
                                          P's Request For Oral Hearing
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 6/4/1984, Entered: None N
                                            Testimony For Defendant
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/10/1984, Entered: None N
                                              Defendant's Notice Of Reliance
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 4/10/1984, Entered: None N
                                                Testimony For Plaintiff
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 12/13/1983, Entered: None T
                                                  Trial Dates Reset
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/29/1983, Entered: None T
                                                    Trial Dates Set
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/14/1983, Entered: None N
                                                      Answer
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/23/1982, Entered: None T
                                                        Pending, Instituted
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 10/29/1982, Entered: None T
                                                          Filed
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?