Classic Brands, Incorporated v. Moxie Industries, Inc. Assignee By

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92014374-CAN
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Classic Brands, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Classic Brands, Incorporated"
v.
No Logo Moxie Industries, Inc. Assignee By, Defendant
Attributes
Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney THOMAS JQUINN
Date in Location 26-JUN-86
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
Charge to Location Code 900
Timeline
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/1986, Entered: None N
Terminated
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/26/1986, Entered: None N
Terminated
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/28/1986, Entered: None T
Board's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/6/1986, Entered: None N
Withdrawal Of Petition For Cancellation
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/1985, Entered: None T
Defendant's Objections To Motion To Vacate
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/15/1986, Entered: None T
Pl's Motion To Vacate Default
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/26/1985, Entered: None T
P's Mot For Exten. Of Time W/ Consent
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/6/1985, Entered: None T
Plaintiff Given Til 12-24-85 To Show Cause
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/18/1984, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Set
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/3/1984, Entered: None N
Answer
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/23/1984, Entered: None T
Notice To Defendant Resent; Answer Due 12-3-84
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/12/1984, Entered: None T
Notice To Defendant Returned By Postal Service As Undeliverable
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/18/1984, Entered: None G
Abandonment
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/1984, Entered: None T
Pending, Instituted
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/13/1984, Entered: None E
Notice Sent; Answer Due (due Date)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/19/1984, Entered: None N
Filed And Fee
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 10 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?