William J. Snell, Iii v. Priority Healthcare Benefits, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92031365-CAN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William J. Snell, Iii, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
v.
No Logo Priority Healthcare Benefits, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Coburn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew J. Himich +1 314 552 6000 +1 314 552 7299 mhimich@thompsoncoburn.com
Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney ALBERT JZERVAS
Date in Location 06-APR-04
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
Charge to Location Code 84K
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 20 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: None T
      Order To Cancel Registration Set Aside; Registration In Full Force
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: None N
        Withdrawal Of Petition For Cancellation
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: None S
          Suspended
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: None N
            Delete Entry
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None T
              Pl's Response
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None T
                Defendant's Memo To Board Regarding Pending Request For Relief From Final Judgment
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None T
                  P's Change Of Address
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None N
                    Terminated
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None T
                      Response Due 10 Days
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None T
                        Pl's Response To Mot For Relief From Fin Al Judgment
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None T
                          D's Req For Relief From Final Judgment W /con
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: None N
                            Terminated
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: None T
                              C.o. Canc. Reg.
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None T
                                Board's Decision: Granted
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None T
                                  Sbp
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: None T
                                    #2 To Def. Returned As Undeliverable
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None T
                                      Pending, Instituted
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: None T
                                        Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None N
                                          Filed And Fee
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 26 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?