The B. Manischewitz Company, Llc v. Royal Wine Corporation
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92040654-CAN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo The B. Manischewitz Company, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ostrolenk Faber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A. Cohen
v.
No Logo Royal Wine Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Royal Wine Corporation
Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney ANGELALYKOS
Date in Location 14-OCT-03
Status Code 9
Location Code 900
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: None T
Comm's Order Cancelling Reg.
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None T
    Def Returned Undel.
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None N
      Terminated
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None T
        Board's Decision: Granted
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: None T
          Notice Of Default
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None T
            Pending, Instituted
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None T
              Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None N
                Filed And Fee
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 21 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?