Negro Leagues Baseball Museum, Inc. v. Black By Popular Demand, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92042943-CAN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Negro Leagues Baseball Museum, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
v.
No Logo Black By Popular Demand, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Cahn & Samuels LLP

Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney CHERYL ABUTLER
Date in Location 30-NOV-04
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
Charge to Location Code 84K
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: None T
      Other Filing
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: None S
        Suspended
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None T
          Pls Mot To Suspend Procs W/consent
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None N
            Answer
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None T
              Pending, Instituted
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None T
                Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: None N
                  Filed And Fee
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 8 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?