Callaway Golf Company v. Merchants Of Golf, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92045137-CAN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Callaway Golf Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Marie Martens +1 858 678 4729 +1 858 678 5099 martens@fr.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder abrams@fr.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder pino@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder hyde@fr.com
v.
No Logo Merchants Of Golf, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
Space Select Brands Inc tmdocketing.elbein@hoveywilliams.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder litigation@hoveywilliams.com
Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney YONG OH (RICHARD)KIM
Date in Location 28-MAR-06
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None T
Board's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None N
    Withdrawal Of Petition For Cancellation
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None T
      Change Of Correspondence Address
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None S
        Suspended
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None W
          Stip To Suspend Pend Settlement Negotns
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None S
            Suspended
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 1/19/2008, Entered: None T
              Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None W
                Extension Of Time Granted
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None T
                  Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None W
                    Extension Of Time Granted
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None T
                      Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None W
                        Extension Of Time Granted
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None T
                          Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None W
                            Extension Of Time Granted
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None T
                              Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None W
                                Extension Of Time Granted
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None T
                                  Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None W
                                    Extension Of Time Granted
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None T
                                      Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None W
                                        Extension Of Time Granted
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None T
                                          Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None N
                                            Answer
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: None T
                                              Pending, Instituted
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: None T
                                                Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: None N
                                                  Filed And Fee
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?