H. Co. Computer Products v. Think Computer Corporation
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92048439-CAN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo H. Co. Computer Products, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "H. Co. Computer Products"

Toggle Switch Represented by Christie Parker & Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary J. Nelson +1 626 795 9900 gary.nelson@cph.com
v.
Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Think Computer Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney ROBERTCOGGINS
Date in Location 15-NOV-07
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None T
Board's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None T
    D's Withdrawal Of Counsel
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None N
      Answer
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None T
        Change Of Correspondence Address
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None W
          Extension Of Time Granted
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None T
            Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 2/23/2008, Entered: None W
              Extension Of Time Granted
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 2/23/2008, Entered: None T
                Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None T
                  Motion To Consoldate Granted, Trail Dates Set.
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None W
                    Extension Of Time Granted
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None T
                      Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None T
                        Change Of Correspondence Address
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None T
                          Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None T
                            Pending, Instituted
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None T
                              Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None N
                                Filed And Fee
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 693 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?