Hdnet Llc v. Matias Coo
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92048582-CAN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

HDNet, LLC HDNet, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aldi Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erin M. Hickey tmdoctc@fr.com
v.
No Logo Matias Coo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mmainsider.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matias Coo mcoo@mmainsider.com
Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney ELIZABETHWINTER
Date in Location 11-DEC-07
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None T
Commr's Order Cancelling Registration
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Granted
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None T
      P's Response To Board Order/inquiry
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None S
        Suspended Pending Disp Of Outstndng Mot
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None M
          P's Motion For Summary Judgment
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None T
            Change Of Correspondence Address
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None N
              Amended Answer
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None T
                Response Due 30 Days (due Date)
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None T
                  P's Motion To Amend Pleading/amended Pleading
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None N
                    Answer
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None T
                      Pending, Instituted
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None T
                        Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None N
                          Filed And Fee
                            LREF

                            Space Space

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 14 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?