Wisconsin Pharmacal Company, Inc. v. Conception Technologies, Lp
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92048621-CAN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Wisconsin Pharmacal Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica S. Sachs, Esq. trademarks@thompsonhine.com
v.
No Logo Conception Technologies, LP, Defendant

Represented by Blanchard Krasner & French

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Hawkes dhawkes@bkflaw.com
Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney ANDREW PBAXLEY
Date in Location 18-DEC-07
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None T
    Board's Decision: Dismissed W/o Prej
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None N
      Withdrawal Of Petition For Cancellation
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None N
        Answer
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None T
          Pending, Instituted
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None T
            Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None N
              Filed And Fee
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 20 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?