Think Computer Corporation v. Facebook, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92049206-CAN

Tags

Reality Check: Facebook, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 24, 2019 article Reality Check: Facebook, Inc..

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Phillips, Erlewine & Given LLP

v.
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Performant Financial Corp
Officer/Director, Auxogyn, Inc.
Officer/Director, Zoetis Inc.
Officer/Director, Quarta-Rad, Inc.
Officer/Director, Canaan Partners Viii Llc
Officer/Director, McAfee Corp.
Robinhood Markets, Inc. Officer/Director, Robinhood Markets, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Thomas Norberg +1 650 843 5889 +1 650 857 0663 jnorberg@cooley.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder laltieri@cooley.com
Space Gretchen R. Stroud +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 857 0663 trademarks@cooley.com
Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney CHERYL ABUTLER
Date in Location 16-APR-08
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None T
Board's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 32 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None N
    Withdrawal Of Petition For Cancellation
      LREF
      Blank 31 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None T
      Confidential Defendant's Supporting Evidents/exhibits
        LREF
        Blank 30 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None T
        Paper Received At Ttab
          LREF
          Blank 29 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None T
          D's Opposition/response To Motion
            LREF
            Blank 28 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None W
            Extension Of Time Granted
              LREF
              Blank 27 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None T
              Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                LREF
                Blank 26 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None S
                Suspended Pending Disp Of Outstndng Mot
                  LREF
                  Blank 25 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None T
                  Confidential Plaintiff's Supporting Evidents/exhibits
                    LREF
                    Blank 24 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None M
                    P's Motion To Compel Discovery
                      LREF
                      Blank 23 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None T
                      Change Of Correspondence Address
                        LREF
                        Blank 22 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None T
                        Appearance
                          LREF
                          Blank 21 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None W
                          Extension Of Time Granted
                            LREF
                            Blank 20 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None T
                            Stipulation For An Extension Of Time
                              LREF
                              Blank 19 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None T
                              D's Appearance Of Counsel/power Of Attorney
                                LREF
                                Blank 18 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None T
                                Trial Dates Reset
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None T
                                  D's Motion For Entry Of Protective Order
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None T
                                    D's Appearance Of Counsel/power Of Attorney
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None T
                                      Answer To Amended Petition
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None X
                                        Proceedings Resumed
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 13 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None T
                                          D's Appearance Of Counsel/power Of Attorney
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 12 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None S
                                            Suspended Pending Disp Of Outstndng Mot
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None T
                                              D's Reply In Support Of Motion
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None T
                                                D's Opposition To Motion For Default Judgment
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None TCourt Filing
                                                  P's Motion For Default Judgement
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None T
                                                    P's Opposition/response To Motion
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None M
                                                      D's Motion To Strike
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None T
                                                        P's Response To D's Motion To Dismiss And Amended Petition To Cancel
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None N
                                                          Answer
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None T
                                                            D's Motion To Dismiss - Rule 12(b)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None T
                                                              Pending, Instituted
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None T
                                                                Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None N
                                                                  Filed And Fee
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Space Space

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 1,025 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?